Marwaha, Avantika (CPSO#: 81399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 32
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 335-1888
Fax: (905) 335-5656
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Marwaha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marwaha ( CPSO# 81399 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
32 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Feb 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVANTIKA MARWAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARWAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 10 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009