Marzouk, Shireen (CPSO#: 101441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIREEN MARZOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARZOUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Feb 2017 to 12 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 10 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018