Masella, JoAnn Stephanie (CPSO#: 71491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Names: Fletcher, JoAnn Stephanie Masella (used until: 31 May 2004 )     Masella, JoAnn Stephanie (used until: 14 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020 Ext. 2149
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masella MacIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. MacIsaac ( CPSO# 70549 )
Dr. J. Masella ( CPSO# 71491 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
42 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANN STEPHANIE MASELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2000