Masellis, Antony (CPSO#: 30325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Bologna, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
5293 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Phone: (905) 294-8011
Fax: (905) 294-8153
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONY MASELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASELLIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013