Maslovitz, Sharon (CPSO#: 85637)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Hadassah Medical School, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 09 Dec 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008