Masnyk, Robert Douglas (CPSO#: 75760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone: (905) 646-7650
Fax: (905) 646-5671
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert D. Masnyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Masnyk ( CPSO# 75760 )

Business Address:
201 - 589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 646-7650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 25 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DOUGLAS MASNYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASNYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2000 to 15 Dec 2000
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2003