Masood, Syed Faraz (CPSO#: 92663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
203-4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone: (905) 3573988
Fax: 9053570968
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E6X2
Canada
Phone: 9053784647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S0A9
Canada
Phone: 9053784647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Syed Faraz Masood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Masood ( CPSO# 92663 )
Dr. S. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 96566 )

Business Address:
St. Catherines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Suite 203
4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone Number: (905) 357-3988

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Apr 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Syed Faraz Masood may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.