Masri, Rogy Omar (CPSO#: 85865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
North Bay ON  P1B5A4
Phone: 705 474 8600 Ext. 4500
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  February 13, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 12, 2014, Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Rogy O. Masri's privileges were revoked, effective February 13, 2014,

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 29, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Rogy Omar Masri, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Masri to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ROGY OMAR MASRI
                                          ("Dr. Masri")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Masri, certificate of registration number 85865, am a member of
                  the College.  I am aware of the College's concern about protecting the
                  public.

            (3)   I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that I currently practice in Ontario performing
                  emergency medicine. I acknowledge that my hospitalist practice is not
                  currently available for reassessment as I do not currently engage in a
                  hospitalist practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Masri, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Masri, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not
                        engage in practice as a hospitalist until both of the following
                        condition have been met: 
                  
                        i.    I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the
                              College of my intent to resume practice as a hospitalist; and
                  
                        ii.   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                              program of continuing professional development that meets the
                              requirements for continuing professional development of the
                              Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the
                              College of Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization
                              that has been approved by the College for that purpose that
                              meets the requirements for continuing professional
                              development set by the Royal College of Physicians and
                              Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of
                              Canada.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Masri, undertake that upon my resumption of a hospitalist
                        practice, I shall, at minimum, submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice within six (6) months.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Masri, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Masri, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Masri, undertake and acknowledge that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Masri's hospitalist practice is not currently available
                              for reassessment as he does not currently engage in a
                              hospitalist practice. 
                  
                              As a result, Dr. Masri must not engage in a hospitalist
                              practice until he provides the College with i) 45 days'
                              notice of his intent to resume practice as a hospitalist and
                              ii) proof that he is participating in a program of continuing
                              professional development.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Masri, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Masri, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Masri, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Masri, give my irrevocable consent to any Chief of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Rogy Omar Masri to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 29, 2018:

Dr. Masri’s hospitalist practice is not currently available for reassessment as he does not currently engage in a hospitalist practice.

As a result, Dr. Masri must not engage in a hospitalist practice until he provides the College with i) 45 days’ notice of his intent to resume practice as a hospitalist and ii) proof that he is participating in a program of continuing professional development.