Massaad, Viviane (CPSO#: 75329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4305
Fax: (905) 721-4770
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Liberty St.. South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 1370
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massabki and Massaad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 5 2013


Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727


Corporation Name: Massaad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4305

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIANE MASSAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSAAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2001