Massabki, Raouf Albert Youssef (CPSO#: 66771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4345
Fax: (905) 721-4881
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massabki and Massaad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 5 2013


Corporation Name: Massabki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Massabki ( CPSO# 66771 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAOUF ALBERT YOUSSEF MASSABKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSABKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1997