Masse, Yanick Nicholas Rosaire (CPSO#: 82677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4212
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yannick Masse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Masse ( CPSO# 82677 )

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4612

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 14 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YANICK NICHOLAS ROSAIRE MASSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008