Mastouri, Negin (CPSO#: 96679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 East Street, S., PO Box 899
Bobcaygeon ON  K0M 1A0
Phone: (705) 738-5575 Ext. 1
Fax: (705) 738-5681
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mastouri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mastouri ( CPSO# 96679 )

Business Address:
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5

Business Address:
100 East Street South
Bobcaygeon ON  K0M 1A0
Phone Number: (705) 738-5575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEGIN MASTOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTOURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 20 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2014