Mastrogiacomo, Frank (CPSO#: 73976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: Mastrogiacomo, Frank (used until: 06 Jul 2004 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 406-5666
Fax: (416) 406-6667
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK MASTROGIACOMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTROGIACOMO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004