Matava, Clyde Tonderayi (CPSO#: 86046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2011

Expiry Date:  14 Oct 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Matava, Cliade Tonderayi (used until: 07 Mar 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zimbabwe, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Matava ( CPSO# 86046 )
Dr. R. Matava ( CPSO# 86349 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 15 Apr 2007
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Feb 2008 to 13 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 14 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Clyde Tonderayi Matava may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  University  of  Toronto, in which Dr. Matava holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of registration will  expire  on  the  earlier  of  the
                  following times:

                  (i)   on October 14, 2019,
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Matava  no  longer  holds  the academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor in the Department of Anaesthesia at the
                        University of Toronto, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Matava's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Matava's clinical
                        performance,  knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does  not  receive  an  annual  report  or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on October 15, 2011.   In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 14, 2019.