Mateos Corral, Dimas (CPSO#: 84973)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad Autonoma De Baja California, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010