Mater, Ahmed Mohamed Abdulla (CPSO#: 75805)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2009