Mathai, Anila Susan (CPSO#: 95206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathai-Wagg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mathai ( CPSO# 95206 )
Dr. S. George ( CPSO# 30797 )
Dr. G. Mathai ( CPSO# 30723 )
Dr. I. Wagg ( CPSO# 90903 )
Dr. B. Wagg ( CPSO# 29190 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANILA SUSAN MATHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013