Mathai, Shyla Rachel (CPSO#: 92568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Medicine
Hospitalist, Oncology & Rehab
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shyla R. Mathai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mathai ( CPSO# 92568 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Medicine
Hospitalist Service
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 May 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Sep 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Shyla Rachel Mathai may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.