Mathew, Andrew Luka (CPSO#: 91865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 5196633120
Fax: 5196633147
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW LUKA MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2010 to 14 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2011 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Apr 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2017 to 31 May 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015