Mathew, Anna T (CPSO#: 82953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Josephs Healthcare
Division of Nephrology
Marian Wing, Room M306
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522 1155 Ext. 34055
Fax: (905) 521 6088
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 22 2013


Corporation Name: Anna T. Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mathew ( CPSO# 82953 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Division of Nephrology
Room M306 Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA T MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009