Mathew, Beena (CPSO#: 91585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Urgent Care Clinic
400 Bronte Street South
Unit # 103
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone: (905) 876-3843
Fax: (905) 876-2486
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B Mathew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mathew ( CPSO# 91585 )

Business Address:
Milton Urgent Care Clinic
400 Bronte Street South
Suite 103
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 876-3843

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEENA MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011