Mathew, George (CPSO#: 86009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705,
Mackay Street
Pembroke
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE MATHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 12 Mar 2007 to 25 May 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 26 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014