Mathew, Sajida (CPSO#: 92542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As   from   July   17,   2015,  the  following  cease-to-practice  Undertaking,
            Acknowledgement and Consent  by  Dr.  Sajida  Mathew  is  imposed  as  a  term,
            condition  and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sajida
            Mathew. 

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. SAJIDA MATHEW
                                          ("Dr. Mathew")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr.  Mathew,  certificate of registration number 92542, am a member of
                  the  College. The College  has  inquired  into  my  compliance  with  the
                  requirement  to  participate  in  a  program  of  continuing professional
                  development.    

            (2)   I, Dr. Mathew, am currently not practicing medicine in Ontario.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I,  Dr. Mathew, undertake to the College that, effective  immediately,  I
                  will  not  practise  medicine  in Ontario until each and every one of the
                  following conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five  (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I  provide the College with proof that  I  am  participating  in  a
                        program  of  continuing  professional  development  that  meets the
                        requirements  for continuing professional development of the  Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada,  or an organization that has been approved by
                        the  College  for that purpose  that  meets  the  requirements  for
                        continuing professional  development  set  by  the Royal College of
                        Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  or  the  College  of  Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (4)   I,  Dr.  Mathew,  undertake  to  the  College  that  upon  signing   this
                  Undertaking  I  shall  forward  a  request  to the General Manager of the
                  Ontario  Health  Insurance  Plan  ("OHIP")  that  my  billing  number  be
                  deactivated for services rendered after the date I  cease to practise and
                  before  the  date  the College agrees that I may return  to  practise  in
                  accordance with the terms of this Undertaking. If I do not have an active
                  Ontario Health Insurance  Plan  ("OHIP")  billing  number, I undertake to
                  provide proof of same to the College.

            (5)   I,  Dr. Mathew, undertake to the College to abide by  the  terms  of  the
                  College's Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who
                  Cease  to  Practise,  Take  an  Extended  Leave of Absence or Close Their
                  Practice  Due  to  Relocation,  a copy of which  is  attached  hereto  as
                  Appendix "A".  I also undertake to  abide  by  the  College's  Policy  on
                  Physicians  Re-entering  Practice,  a copy of which is attached hereto as
                  Appendix "B". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (6)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge that in exchange  for  this  Undertaking,  the
                  College has agreed to take no further action in relation to my failure to
                  participate in a program of continuing professional development.

            (7)   I,  Dr.  Mathew,  acknowledge and agree that in considering my request to
                  return to practice, the Registrar may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that  I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request  that  I   enter  into  an  appropriate  assessment  and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge  and  agree that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges,  expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Mathew, undertake to comply with the  terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking  and acknowledge that a breach by me  of  any  term  of  this
                  Undertaking may  constitute  an  act  of  professional  misconduct and/or
                  incompetence,  and  may result in a referral of specified allegations  to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Mathew, acknowledge  and  confirm  that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking  and  that  I  have
                  obtained  independent  legal  counsel  in  reviewing  and  executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (11)  I,  Dr.  Mathew,  acknowledge  that  this  entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate  of registration for
                  the  purposes  of  section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural  Code,
                  which is Schedule 2  to  the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I  understand  that  this  Undertaking  shall be
                  information  on  the  College's  Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I,  Dr.  Mathew, give my irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to  make
                  appropriate  enquiries  of  OHIP and/or any person or institution who may
                  have  relevant information, in  order  for  the  College  to  monitor  my
                  compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr.  Mathew,  acknowledge  that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C"  and  that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.



            As  from  August  25, 2011, the following term,  condition  and  limitation  is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sajida Mathew: 

                         Dr.  Sajida   Mathew   may   practice  medicine  independently  in
            Psychiatry, only.