Mathias, Michelle Diedra (CPSO#: 86764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
Division of Forensic Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MD Mathias Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mathias ( CPSO# 86764 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Division of Forensic Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE DIEDRA MATHIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHIAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012