Mathoo, Julian Marshall Ranji (CPSO#: 76453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Floor
10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone: (905) 521-6376
Fax: (289) 768-2476
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Physical Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-4941
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Mathoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mathoo ( CPSO# 76453 )

Business Address:
10 Ewen Road
Main Floor
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone Number: (905) 521-6376

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIAN MARSHALL RANJI MATHOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006