Mathur, Arun Kumar (CPSO#: 70580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-3551
Fax: (905) 721-6697
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathur and Mathur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mathur ( CPSO# 69299 )
Dr. A. Mathur ( CPSO# 70580 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-3551

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-3551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARUN KUMAR MATHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHUR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1996