Matin, Roozbeh (CPSO#: 84393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Raod
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matin & Malakieh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Malakieh ( CPSO# 84541 )
Dr. R. Matin ( CPSO# 84393 )

Business Address:
4100 Strandherd Drive
Suite 208
Nepean ON  K2J 0V2
Phone Number: (613) 505-9704

Business Address:
3500 Fallowfield Road
Unit 1C
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROOZBEH MATIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008