Matsuda, Maria Teruko (CPSO#: 90070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kansas, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3N2
Phone: (519) 653-3321
Fax: (519) 220-5913
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria T. Matsuda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matsuda ( CPSO# 90070 )

Business Address:
Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3N2
Phone Number: (519) 653-3321

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA TERUKO MATSUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSUDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Dec 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009