Mattingly III, Thomas Kenneth (CPSO#: 96690)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Texas at San Antonio, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2013