Matys, Gail Lynn (CPSO#: 51053)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Matys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Matys ( CPSO# 51053 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1269

Medical Records Location

Address: 204 - 99 Kakulu Road Ottawa ON K2L 3C8
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018