Maur, Gurpreet Singh (CPSO#: 64924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Rajasthan University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Heart Center
207 - 100 Humber College Bivd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (289) 298-3603
Fax: (647) 436-7814
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

401 - 333 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: (905) 264-0022
Fax: (905) 264-0085
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maur ( CPSO# 64924 )

Business Address:
Ontario Heart Center
207-100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4

Business Address:
Cardio Study Group
401-333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2

Business Address:
Elite Cardiology
410-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 2T3

Business Address:
Accurate Heart Diagnostic Center
205-100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L8X 0H9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURPREET SINGH MAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2014