Mawani, Al-Karim (CPSO#: 63834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Health +
Unit 5
6601 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 6A9
Phone: (905) 642-9995
Fax: (905) 642-9981
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

333 Bay street
15th floor
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 364-3008
Fax: (416) 362-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Mawani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mawani ( CPSO# 63834 )

Business Address:
15th Floor
333 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Phone Number: (416) 364-3008

Business Address:
Family Health Plus
5 - 6601 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 6A9
Phone Number: (905) 642-9995

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AL-KARIM MAWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAWANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992