Maxwell, Timothy John (CPSO#: 84966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 University Avenue
Saint John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 648-6868
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Timothy J. Maxwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Maxwell ( CPSO# 84966 )

Business Address:
Suite 903
560 Proudfoot Lane
London ON  N6H 5C9

Business Address:
400 University Avenue
Saint John NB  E2L 4L4
Phone Number: (506) 648-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011