Mayer, Anna Lisl (CPSO#: 75639)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Saskatchewan
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018