Mayne, Ian Patrick (CPSO#: 93088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 SHEPPARD AVENUE EAST
SUITE 225
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: 647-340-6400
Fax: 416-907-1777
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.P. Mayne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mayne ( CPSO# 93088 )

Business Address:
Suite 225
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (647) 340-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN PATRICK MAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2016