Mayo, Amanda Lee (CPSO#: 88828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St Johns Rehab Campus
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone: (416) 226-6780 Ext. 7161
Fax: 416-226-9819
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

263 Main Street South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-4900
Fax: (905) 853-5284
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda L. Mayo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mayo ( CPSO# 88828 )

Business Address:
263 Main Street South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3Z4
Phone Number: (905) 853-4900

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
St. John's Rehab Campus
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone Number: (416) 226-6780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA LEE MAYO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013