Mazerolle, Maryse Fleur (CPSO#: 80882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hespeler Medical Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Conestoga College
Health Services
299 Doon Valley Dr
Kitchener ON  N2G 4M4
Canada
Phone: 519 748 3509 Ext. 2359
Fax: (519) 748-3509
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Dundurn Medical Centre
50 Dundurn St S.
Hamilton ON  L8P 4W3
Canada
Phone: 9055294040
Fax: 9055294494
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maryse Mazerolle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mazerolle ( CPSO# 80882 )

Business Address:
Hespeler Medical Clinic
12 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYSE FLEUR MAZEROLLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZEROLLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006