Mazhar, Afsheen (CPSO#: 95543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City Centre Family Physicians
Suite 500
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 270-0415
Fax: (905) 848-1500
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali and Mazhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mazhar ( CPSO# 95543 )
Dr. S. Ali ( CPSO# 86989 )

Business Address:
202-216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 426-3366

Business Address:
500-71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 270-0415

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSHEEN MAZHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2014