Mazhar, Danish (CPSO#: 89726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Amherstburg Family Health Team
Unit 101
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 2M4
Phone: (519) 736-7770
Fax: (519) 736-7702
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANISH MAZHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZHAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012