Mazi, Baraa Abdulkareem A (CPSO#: 94271)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 23 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2012