Mazzotta, Paolo (CPSO#: 81172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street,
L4-000, Box #13
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paolo Mazzotta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mazzotta ( CPSO# 81172 )

Business Address:
Temmy Latner Centre
Suite L4-000
Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAOLO MAZZOTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZOTTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006