McAuley, Lindsay Marie (CPSO#: 95107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Western Student Health Services
University Community Centre, RM 11
Western University
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Degen L. McAuley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McAuley ( CPSO# 95107 )
Dr. R. Degen ( CPSO# 90579 )

Business Address:
Western Student Health Services
University Community Centre
Room 11
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY MARIE MCAULEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCAULEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013