McBain, Daniel James (CPSO#: 72260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Bond Street West
Oshawa ON  L1G 1A5
Phone: (800) 319-3760
Fax: (866) 375-1797
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel J. McBain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McBain ( CPSO# 72260 )

Business Address:
Nurse Practitioner-Led Clinic
60 Bond Street West
Oshawa ON  L1G 1A5
Phone Number: (888) 731-0588

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JAMES MCBAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCBAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 29 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000