McBride, Eileen Richelle Agnes (CPSO#: 95027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Sidra Medical and Research Center
Doha QATAR
Qatar
Phone: +974 4003 2957
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eileen McBride Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 12 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Qatar

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 25 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EILEEN RICHELLE AGNES MCBRIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCBRIDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011