McBride, Michelle Ann (CPSO#: 79107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
832 March Road
Kanata ON  K2W 0C9
Phone: (613) 599-5599
Fax: (613) 599-1005
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 206
1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Nepean ON  K2G 1W2
Canada
Phone: (613) 726-7355
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle McBride Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McBride ( CPSO# 79107 )

Business Address:
206 - 1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Nepean ON  K2G 1W2
Phone Number: (613) 726-7355

Business Address:
2 - 832 March Road
Kanata ON  K2W 0C9
Phone Number: (613) 599-5599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANN MCBRIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCBRIDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2006