McCallum, Catherine Lea (CPSO#: 29139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
George Derby Centre
7550 Cumberland Street
Burnaby, BC
V3N 3X5
Burnaby BC  V3N 3X5
Phone: (604) 527-4493
Fax: (604) 527-7236

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE LEA MCCALLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALLUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1991