McCarty, David (CPSO#: 92349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Dec 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Department of Medicine
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3227
Fax: (519) 663-3578
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. David McCarty may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Cardiology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
                        McCarty  holds  an  academic  appointment  at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment. 
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. McCarty no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.