McCarvill, Erin Marie (CPSO#: 88699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2N1
Phone: (416) 470-6690
Fax: (416) 470-6691
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tom Kaul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. McCarvill ( CPSO# 88699 )
Dr. W. Kaul ( CPSO# 27631 )
Dr. T. Kaul ( CPSO# 82447 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5094

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN MARIE MCCARVILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARVILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010