McColl, Linda Cheryl Patricia (CPSO#: 76235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R3G2
Canada
Phone: 519-740-4900
Fax: 519-740-4936
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda McColl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. McColl ( CPSO# 76235 )

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Business Address:
Homewood
Department of Psychiatry
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA CHERYL PATRICIA MCCOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCOLL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006