McCredie, Victoria Anne (CPSO#: 90214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victoria McCredie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. McCredie ( CPSO# 90214 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA ANNE MCCREDIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCREDIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 25 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2009 to 25 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012